This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/27/2023 at 12:00:43 (UTC).

XIAOPING SMALLER VS MARK SMALLER

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 XIAOPING SMALLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARK SMALLER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

XIAOPING SMALLER

Respondent

MARK SMALLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Respondent Attorney

RICHARD JOHN COLE II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - MARK SMALLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE -PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketORDER ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ALIMONY, MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME, MOTION TO ENJOIN RESPONDENT AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 01:30PM - JACS-TEMPORARY ALIMONY; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: DEES, TERI K; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event JACSTALI on 7/20/2023 0130 PM Judge TERI DEES results HEARING HELD on 7/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketFAMILY HEARING PETITIONER PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY RICHARD COLE, ESQUIRE RESPONDENT - PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE COURT REPORTER SHARON BUTLER - PRESENT INTERPRETER LINDA HIBBELNN - PRESENT PARTIES STIPULATED ON AGREEMENT ATTORNEY TO PREPARE ORDER JUDGE TERI K. DEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 7/20/23 AT 130PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY ALIMONY, MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME, MOTION TO ENJOIN RESPONDENT AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $692.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1112956; Tender Amount: $397.50; Receipt Number: 1120545; Tender Amount: $295.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OF MINOR CHILDREN OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1112956

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/7/2023 - id number 2483554

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 12035106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase 412023DR000554DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less