This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 12:18:14 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JOHNNY BROWN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against JOHNNY BROWN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

JOHNNY BROWN

OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

CAROLINE BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURA ELIZABETH NOYES

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY MARK GROGAN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER JOHNNY BROWN

02/16/2021 - ANSWER JOHNNY BROWN

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

02/10/2021 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

SUMMONS SERVED OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/29/2021

02/10/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/29/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TIMOTHY GROGAN OBO JOHNNY BROWN

02/05/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TIMOTHY GROGAN OBO JOHNNY BROWN

SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN NKA CAROLINE BROWN 1/29/2021

02/02/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN NKA CAROLINE BROWN 1/29/2021

SUMMONS SERVED JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN 1/29/2021

02/02/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN 1/29/2021

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/22/2021 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ESUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN / OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. / JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN - 1/22/2021

01/22/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN / OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. / JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN - 1/22/2021

CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE -ATACHED **EFILED** NOTE

01/22/2021 - CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE -ATACHED **EFILED** NOTE

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

01/22/2021 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

01/22/2021 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER JOHNNY BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. 1/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - TIMOTHY GROGAN OBO JOHNNY BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN NKA CAROLINE BROWN 1/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN 1/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$961.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886653; Tender Amount: $961.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - **EFILED** NOTE / EXHIBIT B - **EFILED** MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT D - **EFILED** LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN / OAK TERRACE OF MANATEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. / JOHNNY BROWN AKA JOHNNY J. BROWN - 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT C - **EFILED** CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE -ATACHED **EFILED** NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noyes, Laura Elizabeth