This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 13:30:53 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB VS PATRICIA A HOFFMAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICIA A HOFFMAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PATRICIA A HOFFMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN JOEL LAWSON ESQ

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

01/23/2020 - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

01/21/2020 - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE

12/31/2019 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EFILED FIXED RATE NOTE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE / EFILED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE /

12/06/2019 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EFILED FIXED RATE NOTE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE / EFILED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE /

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

12/06/2019 - NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/06/2019 - NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

12/19/2019 - SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

12/19/2019 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 12/16/2019

12/19/2019 - SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 12/16/2019

SUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 12/13/2019

12/19/2019 - SUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 12/13/2019

SUMMONS SERVED PATRICIA HOFFMAN 12/16/19

12/19/2019 - SUMMONS SERVED PATRICIA HOFFMAN 12/16/19

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

12/06/2019 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - DECEMBER 9 2019

12/06/2019 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - DECEMBER 9 2019

FORM "A"

12/06/2019 - FORM "A"

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

FORM B

12/06/2019 - FORM B

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/06/2019 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

12/06/2019 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT - PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED PATRICIA HOFFMAN 12/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$960.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 783975; Tender Amount: $55.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EFILED FIXED RATE NOTE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE / EFILED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EFILED FIXED RATE MORTGAGE /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA A. HOFFMAN / UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - DECEMBER 9 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORM "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less