This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 05:26:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS TOBI M MORGAN

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against TOBI M MORGAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********20AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

TOBI M MORGAN

Ellenton, FL 34222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIR NADERPOUR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/28/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

12/28/2021 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF DEFENDANTS EXECUTED AN APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF CREDIT FROM THE PLAINTIFF UNTO DEFENDANTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCUMENTATION

12/28/2021 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF DEFENDANTS EXECUTED AN APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF CREDIT FROM THE PLAINTIFF UNTO DEFENDANTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCUMENTATION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TOBI M MORGAN 12/30/2021

12/28/2021 - SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TOBI M MORGAN 12/30/2021

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO TOBI M MORGAN ON 01/04/22

01/04/2022 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO TOBI M MORGAN ON 01/04/22

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED

02/02/2022 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/02/2022 - NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

03/04/2022 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/04/2022 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/21/2022 - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - DOCUMENTS REDACTED PER NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • DocketCompliance NCI - FILED has been created with due date of 3/7/2022 - id number 2353367

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CC009220CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TOBI M MORGAN 12/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 17.1 / ATTACHMENT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 17.1 / ATTACHMENT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 17.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND CURRENT MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF DEFENDANTS EXECUTED AN APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF CREDIT FROM THE PLAINTIFF UNTO DEFENDANTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCUMENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR