This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 01:00:52 (UTC).

WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC VS IOULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IOULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

TIMOTHY J ROBERTSON

IOULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARI LYNNE MARTIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

09/28/2021 - COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT / TIMOTHY J ROBERTSON / OPULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA

09/28/2021 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT / TIMOTHY J ROBERTSON / OPULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/28/2021 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED IOULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA 10/22/2021

10/25/2021 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED IOULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA 10/22/2021

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

11/23/2021 - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM 4/11/2022 AT 3;30PM

02/07/2022 - NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM 4/11/2022 AT 3;30PM

MOTION TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

02/17/2022 - MOTION TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/18/2022 - ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 03:30PM - JACS-CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM 4/11/2022 AT 3;30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM'S REPORT TO THE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$399.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 991586; Tender Amount: $60.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 991586

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00 AssessmentID 11827988

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FOLLOW UP was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 1/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION NOT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 961035

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 10/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT / TIMOTHY J ROBERTSON / OPULIA G PTCHELINTSEVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - AMENDED AND RESTATED DECLARATION OF COVENANTS CONDITIONS AND RESTRICTIONS OF WATERFORD / NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECORD A CLAIM OF LIEN / DRAFT CLAIM OF LIEN / CLAIM OF LIEN / DELINQUENT ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/29/2021 - id number 2287615

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11770307

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CC007246CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less