This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 08:03:11 (UTC).

VITA TYSON BROWN VS DOROTHY HUBBARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 VITA TYSON BROWN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOROTHY HUBBARD. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VITA TYSON BROWN

Defendants

DOROTHY HUBBARD

ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT HAYS CARTER

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFREY SCOTT GOETHE

JASON MICHAEL MILLER

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

08/03/2023 - MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY

07/26/2023 - NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION VITA TYSON BROWN JUNE 29, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM

04/24/2023 - NOTICE OF DEPOSITION VITA TYSON BROWN JUNE 29, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

04/24/2023 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

04/24/2023 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY

04/19/2023 - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY

04/19/2023 - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON-PARTY

DEFENDANT ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

04/19/2023 - DEFENDANT ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

DOROTHY HUBBARD'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

04/18/2023 - DOROTHY HUBBARD'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/19/2023 - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/19/2023 - PLAINTIFE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

STIPULATED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

08/22/2023 - STIPULATED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF CONFLICT

08/02/2023 - NOTICE OF CONFLICT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS JASON M. MILLER, ESQ.,OF NAJMY THOMPSON, P.L. OBO ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN.

08/02/2023 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS JASON M. MILLER, ESQ.,OF NAJMY THOMPSON, P.L. OBO ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN.

DOROTHY HUBBARD'S FIRST AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

07/27/2023 - DOROTHY HUBBARD'S FIRST AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF CONFLICT

06/30/2023 - NOTICE OF CONFLICT

PLAINTIFF VITA TYSON BROWN'S AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

06/28/2023 - PLAINTIFF VITA TYSON BROWN'S AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/27/2023 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • Hearing08/04/2023 at 09:30AM - JACS-PRETRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFLICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS JASON M. MILLER, ESQ.,OF NAJMY THOMPSON, P.L. OBO ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOROTHY HUBBARD'S FIRST AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFLICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: DOROTHY HUBBARD / ERIC CHRISTOPHER BROWN -- ISSUED 8/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - PRENUPTIAL AGREEMENT / STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY VITA TYSON BROWN / OBJECTION TO CLAIM /

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/25/2022 - id number 2423428

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11952589

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003559CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less