Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 14:47:47 (UTC).

VICENTE FERNANDO GARCIA VS KARINA ALIM VELASQUEZ ARREOLA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 VICENTE FERNANDO GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARINA ALIM VELASQUEZ ARREOLA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********95AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VICENTE FERNANDO GARCIA

Bradenton, FL 34205

Respondent

KARINA ALIM VELASQUEZ ARREOLA

Bradenton, FL 34207

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMAGISTRATE'S DECISION AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (NO MINOR CHILDREN).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Hearing07/30/2020 at 11:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: HUDSON, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DATE: JULY 30, 2020 TIME: 11:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Hearing06/16/2020 at 10:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #1 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: HUDSON, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE- VINCENT GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING TUNE 16, 2020 TIME: 10:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE JUNE 16, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL APRIL 28, 2020 AT 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE - KARINA A VELASQUEZ ARREOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE - VINCENTE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED - VINCENTE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less