This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:46:14 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC VS MICHAEL ELLIOTT

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL ELLIOTT. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

MICHAEL ELLIOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISSA ALVAREZ

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED MICHAEL ELLIOTT

03/05/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED MICHAEL ELLIOTT

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL ELLIOTT 01/23/2020

01/21/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL ELLIOTT 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/21/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: NO PARTIES PRESENT NO PROOF CONTINUE FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED MICHAEL ELLIOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797231; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketBORROWER DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION/ BORROWER AUREEMENT/ TRUTH IN LENDING DISCLOSURE/LEDGER/ BILL OF SALE/ ORIGINAL DEBT SALE AFFIDAVIT/ CERTIFICATE OF LOAN SALE ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MICHAEL ELLIOTT 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less