This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 14:12:46 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS CASSANDRA LEARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against CASSANDRA LEARY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

TROY J LEARY

CASSANDRA LEARY

HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRATIK R PATEL

Defendant Attorney

ANGELA A ABBOTT

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ PROPOSED ON UNKNOWN TENANT NKA MARTI LEARY

02/27/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ PROPOSED ON UNKNOWN TENANT NKA MARTI LEARY

CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

02/24/2020 - CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL - PRATIK PATEL OBO PLAINTIFF

01/29/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL - PRATIK PATEL OBO PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPNIENT - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/30/2019

01/17/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPNIENT - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/30/2019

RETURN OF SERVICE - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 1/13/2020

01/17/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 1/13/2020

RETURN OF SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

01/17/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

01/17/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

RETURN OF SERVICE - CASSANDRA LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

01/17/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - CASSANDRA LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

01/15/2020 - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

LETTER IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT - CASSANDRA LEARY AND TROY LEARY

01/15/2020 - LETTER IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT - CASSANDRA LEARY AND TROY LEARY

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

12/12/2019 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ON 12-16-2019 : ***60 DAYS TO RESPOND***UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY C/O ANY OFFICER OR DIRECTOR AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - CASSANDRA LEARY - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

12/12/2019 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ON 12-16-2019 : ***60 DAYS TO RESPOND***UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY C/O ANY OFFICER OR DIRECTOR AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - CASSANDRA LEARY - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

NOTICE OF FILING -EFILED COPY CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

12/12/2019 - NOTICE OF FILING -EFILED COPY CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

12/12/2019 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/12/2019 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

FORM B

12/12/2019 - FORM B

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/12/2019 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RETURNS OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED ON UNKNOWN TENANT NKA MARTI LEARY 5/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL - PRATIK PATEL OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPNIENT - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 1/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - CASSANDRA LEARY - SUMMONS (SERVED) 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$966.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 785847; Tender Amount: $966.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EFILED COPY OF NOTE - EFILED COPY OF MORTGAGE - EFILED COPY OF ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ON 12-16-2019 : ***60 DAYS TO RESPOND***UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY OF MANATEE COUNTY C/O ANY OFFICER OR DIRECTOR AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE - TROY J. LEARY - CASSANDRA LEARY - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING -EFILED COPY CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less