This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 13:38:48 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS CURTIS M MAHONEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 TRUIST BANK filed an Other lawsuit against CURTIS M MAHONEY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********36AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK

Defendants

MARIE C MAHONEY

CURTIS M MAHONEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY LORRAINE CONCILIO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/24/2020 - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/24/2020 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

03/04/2020 - NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON MARIO C MAHONEY AND CURTIS M MAHONEY JR

03/04/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON MARIO C MAHONEY AND CURTIS M MAHONEY JR

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

02/07/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

02/07/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS SERVED CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. 1/31/2020

02/07/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. 1/31/2020

SUMMONS SERVED MARIE C MAHONEY 1/31/2020

02/07/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MARIE C MAHONEY 1/31/2020

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARIE C. MAHONEY/ CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - JANUARY 23 2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARIE C. MAHONEY/ CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - JANUARY 23 2020

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE

01/22/2020 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

01/22/2020 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$972.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 818156; Tender Amount: $18.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON MARIO C MAHONEY AND CURTIS M MAHONEY JR -- ENTERED 3/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ON MARIO C MAHONEY AND CURTIS M MAHONEY JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MARIE C MAHONEY 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$972.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797276; Tender Amount: $954.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE - EXHIBIT A - COPY OF EQUITY LINE ACCOUNT AGREEMENT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ACCESS 3 EQUITY LINE ACCOUNT AGREEMENT AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF MORTGAGE/ EXHIBIT C - LETTER TO CURTIS M MAHONEY JR DATED SEPTEMBER 11, 2019 /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARIE C. MAHONEY/ CURTIS M. MAHONEY, JR. / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 / UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 - JANUARY 23 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ATTACHED CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less