Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 14:43:09 (UTC).

THEODORE ELLIOTT VS SERIGRAPH INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 THEODORE ELLIOTT filed an Other lawsuit against SERIGRAPH INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THEODORE ELLIOTT

Defendants

SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I LLC

SERIGRAPH INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMILA LOSEY BRANNAN

Defendant Attorneys

ELIZABETH BENTON FISHER

JENNIFER K FORTE

DOUGLAS CEDIO SALTARELLI

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

02/19/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, LLC D/B/A CULVER'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

01/29/2021 - DEFENDANT'S, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, LLC D/B/A CULVER'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

01/29/2021 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

01/20/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - DOUGLAS C. SALTARELLI, ESQ OBO SERIGRAPH INC

12/21/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - DOUGLAS C. SALTARELLI, ESQ OBO SERIGRAPH INC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/21/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S

11/19/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL_NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR ORDER SETTING MEDIATION

02/24/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL_NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR ORDER SETTING MEDIATION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

02/19/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I. L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S FIRST NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTEREROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF THEODORE ELLIOTT

01/29/2021 - DEFENDANT SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I. L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S FIRST NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTEREROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF THEODORE ELLIOTT

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I. L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/21/2020 - DEFENDANT SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I. L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL - ELIZABETH B FISHER OBO SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S,

12/21/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL - ELIZABETH B FISHER OBO SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S,

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/19/2020 - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.

11/19/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 09:30AM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: TELCONF; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM MAY 18, 2021 AT 12:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM MAY 18, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING WEDNESDAY, JUNE 2, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M., PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.'S, RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.'S, RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION WITH EXHIBITS A-C NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC. / PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC. / TRANSMISSION LOG / EMAILED CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL JENNIFER K. FORTE, ESQUIRE, OBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY FOR DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIAL_NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR ORDER SETTING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT - SERIGRAPH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 870134; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C. D/B/A CULVER'S / SERIGRAPH, INC -- ISSUED 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C, D/B/A CULVER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SERIGRAPH, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SHERMAN BLUE FRANCHISE I, L.L.C., D/B/A CULVER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANNAN, KAMILA