Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 23:42:28 (UTC).

THE CGC GROUP FLORIDA LLC VS NEKIA CHEMWERKS INC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 THE CGC GROUP FLORIDA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEKIA CHEMWERKS INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********88AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CGC GROUP FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

NEKIA CHEMWERKS INC

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

04/05/2021 - DEFAULT

SUMMONS SERVED DANIEL W FOWLER 03/01/2021

03/02/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED DANIEL W FOWLER 03/01/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/25/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 09:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DEFAULTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY DEREK DIPASQUALE, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT SERVED DEFAULT FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DANIEL W FOWLER 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 895760; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO DANIEL W FOWLER/NEKIA CHEMWORKS INC ON 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less