This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 13:41:50 (UTC).

SYSCO WEST COAST FLORIDA INC VS BLU AGAVE II LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SYSCO WEST COAST FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLU AGAVE II LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYSCO WEST COAST FLORIDA INC

Defendants

COHEN SMALL

BLU AGAVE II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHARINE DENISE HANLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/ INSTRUCTIONS FOR THE ZOOM CONFERENCE

05/20/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/ INSTRUCTIONS FOR THE ZOOM CONFERENCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LIZ,

06/03/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LIZ,

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

06/01/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO COHEN SMALL 4/23/2020

04/22/2020 - ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO COHEN SMALL 4/23/2020

ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC C/O COHEN SMALL, REGISTERED AGENT 4/23/2020

04/22/2020 - ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC C/O COHEN SMALL, REGISTERED AGENT 4/23/2020

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED COHEN SMALL

03/05/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED COHEN SMALL

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LLC

03/05/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LLC

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

02/24/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC/ COHEN SMALL 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC/ COHEN SMALL 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • Hearing06/08/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT NON SERVED CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LIZ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOT TO APPEAR AT PTC - RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/ INSTRUCTIONS FOR THE ZOOM CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$215.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 823111; Tender Amount: $20.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO COHEN SMALL 4/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC C/O COHEN SMALL, REGISTERED AGENT 4/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: NO PARTIES PRESENT NO PROOF CONTINUE FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED COHEN SMALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED BLU AGAVE II, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$215.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797240; Tender Amount: $195.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC CREDIT APPLICATION FORM/INVOICES/ INDIVIDUAL PERSONAL GUARANTY/LETTER FROM HIDAY & RICKE, P.A. SENT CERTIFIED MAIL ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BLU AGAVE II, LLC/ COHEN SMALL 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketHIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less