This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/15/2020 at 15:39:46 (UTC).

SUSAN PHIPPS VS SANDY MEDINA

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 SUSAN PHIPPS filed an Other lawsuit against SANDY MEDINA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********25AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUSAN PHIPPS

Defendant

SANDY MEDINA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

01/15/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 01/08/2020

01/08/2020 - COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 01/08/2020

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/07/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/06/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/06/2020

01/06/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/06/2020

COPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SANDY MEDINA

12/26/2019 - COPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SANDY MEDINA

THREE DAY NOTICE TO TENANT DEMAND FOR PAYMENT OR POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

12/26/2019 - THREE DAY NOTICE TO TENANT DEMAND FOR PAYMENT OR POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

12/26/2019 - CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

SUMMONS SERVED SANDY MEDINA ON 12/26/19

12/27/2019 - SUMMONS SERVED SANDY MEDINA ON 12/26/19

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/26/2019 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

12/26/2019 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED SANDY MEDINA ON 12/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$195.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 788898; Tender Amount: $195.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: SANDY MEDINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE TO TENANT DEMAND FOR PAYMENT OR POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less