This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/30/2020 at 13:32:12 (UTC).

SUNF LLC VS ALEC DIDAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SUNF LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALEC DIDAS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********62AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNF LLC

Defendants

ALEC DIDAS

ANALIZA FANECA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

03/02/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/20/2020

02/14/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/20/2020

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/11/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS POSTED ALEC DIDAS ON 01/25/2020

02/05/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED ALEC DIDAS ON 01/25/2020

SUMMONS POSTED ANALIZA FANECA ON 01/25/2020

02/05/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED ANALIZA FANECA ON 01/25/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ALEC DIDAS AND ANALIZA FANECA/ DEFAULT BY THE CLERK ENTERED 2/7/2020

02/05/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ALEC DIDAS AND ANALIZA FANECA/ DEFAULT BY THE CLERK ENTERED 2/7/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS

02/05/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/05/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/28/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALEC DIDAS/ ANALIZA FANECA 01/24/2020

01/23/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALEC DIDAS/ ANALIZA FANECA 01/24/2020

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

01/23/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED ALEC DIDAS ON 01/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED ANALIZA FANECA ON 01/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AS TO: ALEC DIDAS AND ANALIZA FANECA/ DEFAULT BY THE CLERK ENTERED 2/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$205.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797536; Tender Amount: $205.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLEASE/ THREE DAY NOTICE ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALEC DIDAS/ ANALIZA FANECA 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less