This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 13:39:28 (UTC).

SUNDYNE SUNSHINE LLC VS IRA JERMAINE COLEMAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SUNDYNE SUNSHINE LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against IRA JERMAINE COLEMAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNDYNE SUNSHINE LLC

Defendant

IRA JERMAINE COLEMAN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

02/11/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/04/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 02/03/2020

02/03/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 02/03/2020

SUMMONS POSTED COLEMAN, IRA JERMAINE 1/23/2020

01/23/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED COLEMAN, IRA JERMAINE 1/23/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED- CONTACTED PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED COLEMAN, IRA JERMAINE 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$198.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797265; Tender Amount: $198.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE/COMMERCIAL LEASE AGREEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO IRA JERMANE COLEMAN 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less