This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 20:38:44 (UTC).

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION VS KATELYN SCULERATI

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against KATELYN SCULERATI. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Defendant

KATELYN SCULERATI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY JOSEPH MOUCH

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER LYNN MILLER VEAL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/12/2022 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- OPEN-END DISBURSEMENT RECEIPT / OPEN-END CREDIT AND SECURITY AGREEMENTS AND DISCLOSURE

08/12/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- OPEN-END DISBURSEMENT RECEIPT / OPEN-END CREDIT AND SECURITY AGREEMENTS AND DISCLOSURE

SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 8/17/2022 AS TO KATELYN SCULERATI

08/12/2022 - SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 8/17/2022 AS TO KATELYN SCULERATI

SUMMONS SERVED KATELYN SCULERATI 08/31/2022

09/12/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED KATELYN SCULERATI 08/31/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS / JENNIFER MILLER VEAL OBO DEFENDANT

09/20/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS / JENNIFER MILLER VEAL OBO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/20/2022 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/23/2022 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS AND TO WITHHOLD JUDGMENT

10/31/2022 - STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS AND TO WITHHOLD JUDGMENT

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH RESERVING JURISDICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/08/2022 - ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH RESERVING JURISDICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

COPY OF STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT IN DESOTO, MANATEE AND SARASOTA COUNTIES

08/12/2022 - COPY OF STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT IN DESOTO, MANATEE AND SARASOTA COUNTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH RESERVING JURISDICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS AND TO WITHHOLD JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS / JENNIFER MILLER VEAL OBO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KATELYN SCULERATI 08/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1061945; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1061945

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 8/17/2022 AS TO KATELYN SCULERATI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT IN DESOTO, MANATEE AND SARASOTA COUNTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- OPEN-END DISBURSEMENT RECEIPT / OPEN-END CREDIT AND SECURITY AGREEMENTS AND DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/13/2022 - id number 2419369

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11947222

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CC004783CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less