This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/24/2023 at 22:02:27 (UTC).

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION VS JERISSA D HEAVEN

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JERISSA D HEAVEN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JERISSA D HEAVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY JOSEPH MOUCH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/10/2023 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT SUNCOAST ACCOUNT STATEMENT/SIGNATURE CARD

02/10/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT SUNCOAST ACCOUNT STATEMENT/SIGNATURE CARD

NOTICE OF PRETRAIL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JERISSA D. HEAVEN - ISSUED 2/13/2023

02/10/2023 - NOTICE OF PRETRAIL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JERISSA D. HEAVEN - ISSUED 2/13/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1114532; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRETRAIL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JERISSA D. HEAVEN - ISSUED 2/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT SUNCOAST ACCOUNT STATEMENT/SIGNATURE CARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1114532

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 3/27/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1508144

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/11/2023 - id number 2485394

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12037771

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC000816SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less