This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/28/2023 at 21:21:39 (UTC).

SHEA SCHREPF VS JESSICA SCHREPF

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 SHEA SCHREPF filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JESSICA SCHREPF. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEA SCHREPF

Respondent

JESSICA SCHREPF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY AND WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ROBERT J HOFFMAN T JUDGE DEES REGARDING FINAL JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUPDATED DIVISIONS 3 AND 4 SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISIONS 3 AND 4 SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION 4: FAMILY COURT SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES CHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT DEVIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING SECOND CORRECTED CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET- FILED BY ROBERT J. HOFFMAN , ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET( SHEA SCHREPF) FILED BY ROBERT J. HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER , AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketBASIC PARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINA! CIAL AFFIDAVIT { LONG FORM) PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCIEA) AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/20/2022 - id number 2434693

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 11967450

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase 412022DR003964DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less