This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/20/2023 at 22:53:13 (UTC).

SCOTT METCALF VS CITY OF BRADENTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 SCOTT METCALF filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF BRADENTON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT METCALF

Defendants

CITY OF BRADENTON

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRELL PATTON YOUNGBLOOD JR

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/18/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/18/2022 - COMPLAINT

CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

04/20/2022 - CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO CITY OF BRADENTON/ FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION/ AND MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS -JUNE 16 2022

06/14/2022 - SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO CITY OF BRADENTON/ FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION/ AND MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS -JUNE 16 2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES T.R. UNICE, JR., ESQUIRE OBO CITY OF BRADENTON.

06/17/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES T.R. UNICE, JR., ESQUIRE OBO CITY OF BRADENTON.

MOTION TO DISMISS CITY OF BRADENTON,

06/17/2022 - MOTION TO DISMISS CITY OF BRADENTON,

DEFENDANT?'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS

06/20/2022 - DEFENDANT?'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/28/2022 - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/29/2022 - DEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/29/2022 - DEFENDANT'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

07/01/2022 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/12/2022 - MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FROM DEFENDANT, CITY OF BRADENTON

07/25/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FROM DEFENDANT, CITY OF BRADENTON

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

08/29/2022 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FROM DEFENDANT, CITY OF BRADENTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 10:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S, CITY OF BRADENTON, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT?'S, "MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS" MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CITY OF BRADENTON,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO CITY OF BRADENTON/ FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION/ AND MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS -JUNE 16 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $430.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1003801; Tender Amount: $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1003801

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/19/2022 - id number 2348031

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11849798

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA000671CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less