This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 16:52:19 (UTC).

SCOTT FRYER VS OELKER ENTERPRISES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SCOTT FRYER filed an Other lawsuit against OELKER ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********24AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT FRYER

Defendants

OELKER ENTERPRISES INC

SHAWN BOZARTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON DAVID HOTTMAN

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, SCOTT FRYER

06/05/2020 - DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, SCOTT FRYER

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/05/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/04/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

SUMMONS SERVED SHAWN BOZARTH 05-01-2020

05/04/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED SHAWN BOZARTH 05-01-2020

RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION, SERVED BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER BILLING

04/09/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION, SERVED BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER BILLING

DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S PRIVILEGE LOG FILED IN ACCORDANCE WITH DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/16/2020 - DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S PRIVILEGE LOG FILED IN ACCORDANCE WITH DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/05/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

03/02/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF, SCOTT FRYER

02/18/2020 - DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF, SCOTT FRYER

DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC. A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/10/2020 - DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC. A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

01/22/2020 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

01/22/2020 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

01/22/2020 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: SHAWN BOZARTH / OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION, D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: SHAWN BOZARTH / OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION, D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT - EXHIBITS A- B COPY OF COMPLAINT AND RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAWN BOZARTH ENTERED JUNE 24 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAWN BOZARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S, SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, SCOTT FRYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT EXHIBITS A - C --RETURN OF SERVICE /MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFAULT /NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF, DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WAYNE HARRIS, AS THE BENEFICIARY OF THE ESTATE OF JEANETTE MARIE HARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT, OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES DATED MARCH 5, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION,RETURNED SERVED MAY, 8 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797095; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: SHAWN BOZARTH / OELKER ENTERPRISES, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION, D/B/A CORTEZ KITCHEN -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less