This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 14:37:36 (UTC).

SAHER KADER VS MARISSA CHRISTIANSEN

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 SAHER KADER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MARISSA CHRISTIANSEN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********94AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAHER KADER

Defendant

MARISSA CHRISTIANSEN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

03/02/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

THREE-DAY NOTICE TO TENANT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

01/29/2020 - THREE-DAY NOTICE TO TENANT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT IS DENIED

02/25/2020 - ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT IS DENIED

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/24/2020 - EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY FORWARDED TO JUDGE

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **RE-RECORDED TO REFLECT CORRECT CASE NUMBER**- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/21/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **RE-RECORDED TO REFLECT CORRECT CASE NUMBER**- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/21/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/21/2020

02/21/2020 - COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/21/2020

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT/DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT 2/20/2020

02/21/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT/DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT 2/20/2020

RESPONSE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/21/2020 - RESPONSE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/19/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M. DEFENDANT MUST DEPOSIT FEBRUARY, 2020, RENT IN THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 4:00 PM ON TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2020, FAILURE TO DEPOSIT MONEY WILL RESULT AN IMMEDIATE FINAL JUDGMENT AND HEARING WILL BE CANCELLED

02/11/2020 - ORDER SCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M. DEFENDANT MUST DEPOSIT FEBRUARY, 2020, RENT IN THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 4:00 PM ON TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2020, FAILURE TO DEPOSIT MONEY WILL RESULT AN IMMEDIATE FINAL JUDGMENT AND HEARING WILL BE CANCELLED

LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/10/2020 - LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

02/06/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

SUMMONS SERVED MARISSA CHRISTIANSEN 1/29/2020

02/04/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MARISSA CHRISTIANSEN 1/29/2020

ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/04/2020 - ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/29/2020 - COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/29/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT IS DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AS TO COPY OF CHECK - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Hearing02/21/2020 at 02:00PM - JACS-DETERMINE RENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION **RE-RECORDED TO REFLECT CORRECT CASE NUMBER**- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT/DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, DEFENSES, AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$198.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 799518; Tender Amount: $198.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MELISSA CHRISTIANSEN 1/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE-DAY NOTICE TO TENANT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less