This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 13:56:26 (UTC).

SABRINA ELISE KIMBALL VS JONATHAN ANDREW VARNES

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 SABRINA ELISE KIMBALL filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against JONATHAN ANDREW VARNES. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********15AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SABRINA ELISE KIMBALL

Parrish, FL 34219

Respondent

JONATHAN ANDREW VARNES

Augustine, FL 32092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

TERRY J SHOEMAKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Hearing07/22/2020 at 08:30AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Hearing07/22/2020 at 08:30AM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING- GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION SERVED - 7/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION: HEARING DATE JULY 22, 2020 8:30 A.M. (SENT TO MSO FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION FILED BY RESPONDENT - COPY OF RESPONDENT'S CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: TERRY J. SHOEMAKER, ESQ ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISSOLVE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY INTAKE DETERMINATION REPORT FOR VIOLATION OF INJUNCTION. THE CASE REMAINS UNDER INVESTIGATION BY THE STATE ATTORNEY. INCIDENT DATE: 04/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING- SERVED 1/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING (SENT TO MSO AND ST JOHNS SHERIFF, FL FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO PETITION - TEXT MESSAGES, SOCAL MEDIA POSTS, MANATEE SHERIFF' VICTIMS RIGHTS BROCHURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less