This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/08/2022 at 12:06:59 (UTC).

RYAN, LLC C/O ROBERT PEYTON, TAH MS BORROWER LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 RYAN, LLC C/O ROBERT PEYTON, TAH MS BORROWER LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAH MS BORROWER LLC

4626 Trout River Xing

Ellenton, FL 34222

Not Yet Classified

RYAN, LLC C/O ROBERT PEYTON

500 East Broward Blvd., Suite 1130 Fort

Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

VAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

09/16/2021 - VAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/16/2021 - NOTICE OF HEARING

WITHDRAWAL

10/28/2021 - WITHDRAWAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 09:00AM - VAB Other Value; Location: OTHER; Room: OTHER; Judge: NO, JUDGE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type VBWD was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event VAB Other Value on 11/8/2021 0900 AM Judge JUDGE NO results CANCELLED on 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance VBWD has been created with due date of 10/29/2021 - id number 2297953

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type VBEM was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 9/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCompliance VBEM has been created with due date of 9/23/2021 - id number 2283761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCompliance VBEM has been created with due date of 9/18/2021 - id number 2281417

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$15.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 956056; Tender Amount: $15.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 956056

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent VAB Other Value scheduled on 11/8/2021 at 0900 AM, OT - Judge JUDGE NO presiding. EventID 1357454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $15.00 AssessmentID 11759529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketUNAVAILABLE DATES: NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase 412021XX000241VBAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAH MS BORROWER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RYAN LLC is a litigant