This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 15:55:23 (UTC).

ROBIN OLIVIO VS BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 ROBIN OLIVIO filed an Other lawsuit against BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBIN OLIVIO

Defendants

HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON KYLE WHITTEMORE

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTY ELIZABETH MONTOTO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/08/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/08/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

05/08/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

05/08/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF EARNINGS AND EARNING CAPACITY AND FOR MENTAL ANGUISH

05/06/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF EARNINGS AND EARNING CAPACITY AND FOR MENTAL ANGUISH

DEFENDANTS BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM AND HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/06/2020 - DEFENDANTS BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM AND HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/06/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - CHRISTY E MONTOTO OBO DEFENDANTS

04/06/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - CHRISTY E MONTOTO OBO DEFENDANTS

SUMMONS SERVED BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM 3/16/2020

03/25/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM 3/16/2020

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM

01/22/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

01/22/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/19/2020 - MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ALIAS SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM / HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM -- ISSUED 2/20/2020

02/18/2020 - ALIAS SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM / HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM -- ISSUED 2/20/2020

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM,

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM,

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS, BARBARA DENHAM'S AND HOWARD DENHAM'S, NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF EARNINGS AND EARNING CAPACITY AND FOR MENTAL ANGUISH

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$440.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797258; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM / HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BARBARA STANCLIFF DENHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HOWARD DANIEL DENHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION BY JASON K. WHITTEMORE OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less