This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/22/2021 at 23:02:51 (UTC).

ROBERT HORVATH VS SPECTRUM MOBILE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 ROBERT HORVATH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SPECTRUM MOBILE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT HORVATH

Defendant

SPECTRUM MOBILE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED SPECTRUM MOBILE 2/5/2021

02/10/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED SPECTRUM MOBILE 2/5/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED SPECTRUM MOBILE 2/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886658; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO SPECTRUM MOBILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less