This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/16/2020 at 16:46:40 (UTC).

RICHARD ZIMMERMAN VS STILLMANS TREE SERVICE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 RICHARD ZIMMERMAN filed an Other lawsuit against STILLMANS TREE SERVICE LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD ZIMMERMAN

Defendant

STILLMANS TREE SERVICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREA M JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/24/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/15/2020 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES

06/05/2020 - NOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

04/29/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/29/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

03/10/2020 - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING MONDAY, MARCH 9, 2020 AT 1:45PM

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING MONDAY, MARCH 9, 2020 AT 1:45PM

MOTION TO STRIKE PLEADINGS

02/24/2020 - MOTION TO STRIKE PLEADINGS

INVOICE/ LAST NOTICE ATTACHED TO AFFIDAVIT

02/14/2020 - INVOICE/ LAST NOTICE ATTACHED TO AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/14/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/14/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUMMONS SERVED STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICES LLC ON 01/27/2020

01/28/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICES LLC ON 01/27/2020

CIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A / CHECK FROM DEFENDANT

01/22/2020 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A / CHECK FROM DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICE LLC 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICE LLC 01/23/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 01:45PM - JACS-STRIKE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING MONDAY, MARCH 9, 2020 AT 1:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVOICE/ LAST NOTICE ATTACHED TO AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICES LLC ON 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797315; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: STILLMAN'S TREE SERVICE LLC 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT EXHIBIT A / CHECK FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less