This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/25/2023 at 12:04:38 (UTC).

RICARDO G MARQUES VS KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 RICARDO G MARQUES filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME ORLANDO LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICARDO G MARQUES

Defendant

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

Not Yet Classified

BRANCO PREMIER STUCCO LLC

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA EVAN BURNETT

Defendant Attorney

DANA CHAABAN

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BENJAMIN WAYNE DOWERS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/07/2022 - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

09/07/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS GUNTHER LEGAL, PLLC

03/09/2023 - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS GUNTHER LEGAL, PLLC

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

01/24/2023 - THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BENJAMIN W. DOWERS, ESQ., AND EMILY A. TROESCH, ESQ. OBO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC

01/24/2023 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BENJAMIN W. DOWERS, ESQ., AND EMILY A. TROESCH, ESQ. OBO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC

AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL & REFERRAL TO MEDIATION JURY TRIAL PERIOD: MARCH 11, 2024 / PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE: FEBRUARY 29, 2024 @9:30 AM

01/24/2023 - AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL & REFERRAL TO MEDIATION JURY TRIAL PERIOD: MARCH 11, 2024 / PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE: FEBRUARY 29, 2024 @9:30 AM

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (DESIGNATION - GENERAL CIRCUIT CIVIL) THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

01/24/2023 - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (DESIGNATION - GENERAL CIRCUIT CIVIL) THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

01/19/2023 - AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF SERVING KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S VERIFIED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

01/10/2023 - NOTICE OF SERVING KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S VERIFIED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S, KB HOME ORLANDO LLC, RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/07/2022 - DEFENDANT'S, KB HOME ORLANDO LLC, RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT, KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/07/2022 - DEFENDANT, KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A- MASTER SUBCONTRACT / WORK AGREEMENT / WITH EXHIBITS TO BOTH /

10/10/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A- MASTER SUBCONTRACT / WORK AGREEMENT / WITH EXHIBITS TO BOTH /

PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

09/07/2022 - PLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

09/07/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

AMENDED CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (FOR GENERAL TRACK CASES) JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

11/14/2022 - AMENDED CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (FOR GENERAL TRACK CASES) JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

AMENDED CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (FOR GENERAL TRACK CASES) JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

11/14/2022 - AMENDED CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (FOR GENERAL TRACK CASES) JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF SERVING KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2022 - NOTICE OF SERVING KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS GUNTHER LEGAL, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BENJAMIN W. DOWERS, ESQ., AND EMILY A. TROESCH, ESQ. OBO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL & REFERRAL TO MEDIATION JURY TRIAL PERIOD: MARCH 11, 2024 / PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE: FEBRUARY 29, 2024 @9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (DESIGNATION - GENERAL CIRCUIT CIVIL) THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event CSMGMT on 1/24/2023 0900 AM Judge EDWARD NICHOLAS results CANCELLED on 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S VERIFIED RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Hearing12/01/2022 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC - SEPTEMBER 9 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1069134

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/8/2022 - id number 2428800

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11959509

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003742CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less