This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/27/2021 at 13:32:21 (UTC).

REALTY INCOME CORPORATION, RYAN LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 REALTY INCOME CORPORATION, RYAN LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REALTY INCOME CORPORATION

6919 Sr 70 E

Bradenton, FL 34205

Not Yet Classified

RYAN LLC

500 East Broward Blvd., Suite 1130 Ft

Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

VAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

09/08/2021 - VAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/16/2021 - NOTICE OF HEARING

WITHDRAWAL

10/12/2021 - WITHDRAWAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 09:00AM - VAB Other Value; Location: OTHER; Room: OTHER; Judge: NO, JUDGE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event VAB Other Value on 11/8/2021 0900 AM Judge JUDGE NO results CANCELLED on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type VBWD was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCompliance VBWD has been created with due date of 10/13/2021 - id number 2291278

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$15.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 953835; Tender Amount: $15.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type VBEM was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 9/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCompliance VBEM has been created with due date of 9/9/2021 - id number 2277862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVAB PETITION - REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 953835

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent VAB Other Value scheduled on 11/8/2021 at 0900 AM, OT - Judge JUDGE NO presiding. EventID 1355879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $15.00 AssessmentID 11756955

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketUNAVILABLE DATES: NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase 412021XX000096VBAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RYAN LLC is a litigant