This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 11:06:44 (UTC).

RAYMOND ENRIGHT VS MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 RAYMOND ENRIGHT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********35AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND ENRIGHT

Defendant

MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING ON 02/19/2020

02/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING ON 02/19/2020

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS/ STATEMENT OF CLAIM/ COPY OF CHECK ATTACHED TO NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING ON 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MANATEE RIVER ASSISTED LIVING 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less