This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 19:07:44 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO VS FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO filed an Other lawsuit against FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********92AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Defendant

FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL RAYMOND MARKCITY

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY MARK GROGAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COUNTY ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

06/04/2020 - NOTICE OF COUNTY ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

05/22/2020 - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

ORDER CANCELING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

05/22/2020 - ORDER CANCELING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 26, 2020 AT 10:30 AM

05/08/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 26, 2020 AT 10:30 AM

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

04/07/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

SUMMONS SERVED FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS ON 01/15/2020

02/21/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS ON 01/15/2020

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS

02/13/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS

ANSWER

02/12/2020 - ANSWER

WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

02/12/2020 - WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

02/03/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS -DECEMBER 31 2019

12/26/2019 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS -DECEMBER 31 2019

COMPLAINT

12/26/2019 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/26/2019 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • Hearing06/26/2020 at 10:30AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COUNTY ZOOM MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 26, 2020 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS ON 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 789299; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: FRANK MICHAEL KIRLANGITIS -DECEMBER 31 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less