This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/18/2020 at 19:30:00 (UTC).

PRCP BRADENTON LLC VS ALIZE CRUZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 PRCP BRADENTON LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALIZE CRUZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRCP BRADENTON LLC

Defendants

ALIZE CRUZ

JASON RIVERA

JUDITH CARMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW EDWARD SIEGEL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PREMISES VACATED

02/19/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PREMISES VACATED

REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

02/10/2020 - REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/28/2020 - ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF

01/28/2020 - ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT STIPULATION SIGNED

01/21/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT STIPULATION SIGNED

MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

01/21/2020 - MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

01/21/2020 - STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

REQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

12/23/2019 - REQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

REQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

12/23/2019 - REQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

REQUEST FOR HEARING FORWARDED TO JUDGE

12/23/2019 - REQUEST FOR HEARING FORWARDED TO JUDGE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/17/2019 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALIZE CRUZ/ JUDITH CARMONA AKA JUDITH ALEXIS CARMONA/ JASON RIVERA 12/13/2019

12/13/2019 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALIZE CRUZ/ JUDITH CARMONA AKA JUDITH ALEXIS CARMONA/ JASON RIVERA 12/13/2019

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

12/13/2019 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PREMISES VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT PAYABLE TO PRCP-BRADENTON LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CF BRADENTON GARDENS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:4 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$833.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 789801; Tender Amount: $309.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MORE TIME FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR HEARING FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:4 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$833.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 785864; Tender Amount: $215.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAPARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT/ THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALIZE CRUZ/ JUDITH CARMONA AKA JUDITH ALEXIS CARMONA/ JASON RIVERA 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less