This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 07:00:55 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS YVONNE CHABASSOL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YVONNE CHABASSOL. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

YVONNE CHABASSOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAYNA L SINGER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/27/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/27/2023 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE / DECLARATION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS/ SUMMARY OF ACTIVITY

01/27/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE / DECLARATION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS/ SUMMARY OF ACTIVITY

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO YVONNE CHABASSOL - ISSUED 1/30/2023

01/27/2023 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO YVONNE CHABASSOL - ISSUED 1/30/2023

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

01/27/2023 - NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NON SERVICE RETURN/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ YVONNE CHABASSOL C/O YYONNE CHABASSOL

03/07/2023 - NON SERVICE RETURN/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ YVONNE CHABASSOL C/O YYONNE CHABASSOL

STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT

03/13/2023 - STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY MARY MARGARET WARREN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT PRESENT, PRO SE SERVICE WAIVED STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT-TO BE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 3/13/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 3/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON SERVICE RETURN/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ YVONNE CHABASSOL C/O YYONNE CHABASSOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO FURTHER ACTION NEEDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1110166; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCompliance NCI - FILED has been created with due date of 1/31/2023 - id number 2480405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1110166

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 3/13/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1504346

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO YVONNE CHABASSOL - ISSUED 1/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT BILL OF SALE / DECLARATION OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS/ SUMMARY OF ACTIVITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/28/2023 - id number 2480404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12030667

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC000542SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less