This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 00:00:50 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS JOSEPH OBAS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSEPH OBAS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

JOSEPH OBAS

Palmetto, FL 34221-8349

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAYNA L SINGER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/10/2022 - COMPLAINT

BILL OF SALE/ACCOUNT STATEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

06/10/2022 - BILL OF SALE/ACCOUNT STATEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 6/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO FURTHER ACTION NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1042282; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCompliance NCI - FILED has been created with due date of 6/15/2022 - id number 2392624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1042282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED - FORM MUST INCLUDE COURT ASSIGNED ZOOM INFORMATION OR UTILIZE CLERKS NOTICE TO APPEAR VISIT OUR WEBSITE TO OBTAIN ZOOM INFORMATION OR NOTICE - FEES PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF SALE/ACCOUNT STATEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/11/2022 - id number 2392622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11912389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC003447SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ