This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/20/2020 at 15:10:07 (UTC).

PINGORA LOAN SERVICING LLC VS BRIAN J KEANE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PINGORA LOAN SERVICING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BRIAN J KEANE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINGORA LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

HERITAGE HARBOUR MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

MELINDA A KEANE

BRIAN J KEANE

STONEYBROOK AT HERITAGE HARBOUR COMMUNITY ASSOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAITLIN HOPE CLARK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/13/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/13/2020 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MELINDA A. KEANE / HERITAGE HARBOUR MASTER ASSOCIATON, INC. / STONEYBROOK AT HERITAGE HARBOUR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC./ BRIAN J. KEANE / UNKNOWN PARTY #1 / UNKNOWN PARTY #2 -- ISSUED 1/24/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MELINDA A. KEANE / HERITAGE HARBOUR MASTER ASSOCIATON, INC. / STONEYBROOK AT HERITAGE HARBOUR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC./ BRIAN J. KEANE / UNKNOWN PARTY #1 / UNKNOWN PARTY #2 -- ISSUED 1/24/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET - 2ND PAGE BLANK

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET - 2ND PAGE BLANK

VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURECLAIM

01/22/2020 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURECLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,997.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 805387; Tender Amount: $18.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,997.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797302; Tender Amount: $1,978.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT - COPY OF CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE - COPY OF NOTE / COPY OF MORTGAGE / COPY OF ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / COPY OF NOTICE(S) /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MELINDA A. KEANE / HERITAGE HARBOUR MASTER ASSOCIATON, INC. / STONEYBROOK AT HERITAGE HARBOUR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC./ BRIAN J. KEANE / UNKNOWN PARTY #1 / UNKNOWN PARTY #2 -- ISSUED 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN J. KEANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN J. KEANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURECLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - 2ND PAGE BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less