This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/03/2021 at 12:06:24 (UTC).

PETER KREISSLE VS BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FU Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 PETER KREISSLE filed an Other lawsuit against BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FU. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********84AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER KREISSLE

Defendants

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIV

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FU

MANATEE COUNTY

PARADISE BAY ESTATES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT DAVID MCKAY

Defendant Attorneys

MATTHEW J KNOLL

JONATHAN P WHITNEY

 

Court Documents

JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS

02/22/2021 - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS

DEFENDANT, DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA MOTION TO DISMISS

02/22/2021 - DEFENDANT, DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA MOTION TO DISMISS

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL SERVICE ADDRESS

02/09/2021 - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL SERVICE ADDRESS

SUMMONS SERVED BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA FEBRUARY, 2 2021

02/04/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA FEBRUARY, 2 2021

SUMMONS SERVED THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS FEBRUARY, 2 2021

02/04/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS FEBRUARY, 2 2021

SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY FEBRUARY, 1 2021

02/04/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY FEBRUARY, 1 2021

SUMMONS SERVED PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. FEBRUARY, 3 2021

02/04/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. FEBRUARY, 3 2021

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY ACTION

01/22/2021 - COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY ACTION

ESUMMONS ISSUED: PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. / MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA / THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS / BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - 1/22/2021

01/22/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. / MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA / THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS / BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - 1/22/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL SERVICE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA FEBRUARY, 2 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS FEBRUARY, 2 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY FEBRUARY, 1 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. FEBRUARY, 3 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$440.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886656; Tender Amount: $440.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT O COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A - COPY OF CURRENT SUBMERGED LAND LEASE / CSL COVER SHEET / EXHIBIT B - BOARD OF TRUSTEES LAND DOCUMENT SYSTEM (BTLDS) MAP / EXHIBIT C - BOARD OF TRUSTEES LAND DOCUMENT SYSTEM (BTLDS) MAP / EXHIBIT D - PHOTO OF 1 BAYVIEW DRIVE BOAT RAMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: PARADISE BAY ESTATES, INC. / MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA / THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIVISION OF STATE LANDS / BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT TRUST FUND OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION DIV is a litigant

Latest cases where MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKAY, SCOTT