This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 08:40:04 (UTC).

PAULA LEE Et Al VS JAMES STEPHEN SNYDER JR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PAULA LEE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JAMES STEPHEN SNYDER JR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PAULA LEE

THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

JAMES STEPHEN SNYDER JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPREP SHEET FOR NEW DEPOSITORY CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TO REDIRECT SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketINCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketINCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less