Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 01:16:52 (UTC).

PAMELA EVE BROWN VS KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 PAMELA EVE BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMELA EVE BROWN

Defendants

KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER

THOMAS JAMES

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON FINAL HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

07/08/2020 - ORDER ON FINAL HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

07/08/2020 - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ORDER CANCELING FINAL HEARING AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SAME DATE AND TIME

06/16/2020 - ORDER CANCELING FINAL HEARING AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SAME DATE AND TIME

ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 7/2/2020 AT 3PM

04/20/2020 - ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 7/2/2020 AT 3PM

ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 05/12/2020 AT 9:00 AM

03/23/2020 - ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 05/12/2020 AT 9:00 AM

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/02/2020 - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

SUMMONS SERVED THOMAS JAMES ON 01/24/2020

01/31/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED THOMAS JAMES ON 01/24/2020

SUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER ON 01/24/2020

01/31/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER ON 01/24/2020

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

01/17/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/17/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Hearing09/22/2020 at 01:30PM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON FINAL HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 03:00PM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 03:00PM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELING FINAL HEARING AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SAME DATE AND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearing05/12/2020 at 09:00AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 7/2/2020 AT 3PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL HEARING TO 05/12/2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Hearing03/19/2020 at 09:00AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, PRO SE DEFENDANTS PRESENT, PRO SE SERVED DENY CLAIM SENT TO MEDIATION TRIAL SET ON MARCH 19, 2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED THOMAS JAMES ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GREER ON 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO KATHLEEN GREER/THOMAS JAMES 1/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less