This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/28/2020 at 14:23:52 (UTC).

PALM GROVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC VS ROBERT GARCIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PALM GROVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBERT GARCIA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM GROVE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

TRACY M OCONNELL

ROBERT GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARI LYNNE MARTIN

 

Court Documents

ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED TO BE AS TO: ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL

05/11/2020 - ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED TO BE AS TO: ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED TRACY M. O'CONNELL

02/19/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED TRACY M. O'CONNELL

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ROBERT GARCIA

02/19/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ROBERT GARCIA

SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT ON 02/18/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT ON 02/18/2020

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/22/2020 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL/ UNKNOWN TENANT(S) 01/24/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL/ UNKNOWN TENANT(S) 01/24/2020

COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$359.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 826049; Tender Amount: $20.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketPursuant to Executive Order Number 20-94 (Emergency Management COVID 19 Mortgage Foreclosure and Eviction Relief signed by the Governor on April 2,2020 our office will be suspending actions pertaining to mortgage foreclosure and eviction causes of action as it relates to non-payment of rent (ie: cancelling all foreclosure sales, issuance of titles, issuance of writs of possessions, issuance of summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED TO BE AS TO: ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED TRACY M. O'CONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ROBERT GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT ON 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$359.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798004; Tender Amount: $339.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CONDOMINIUM FOR PALM GROVE, A CONDOMINIUM / NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE LIEN / NOTICE AND CLAIM OF LIEN/ DELINQUENT ASSESSMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED ROBERT GARCIA/ TRACY M. O'CONNELL/ UNKNOWN TENANT(S) 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less