This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/01/2021 at 23:09:19 (UTC).

NYA CHAMBLESS Et Al VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 NYA CHAMBLESS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARASOTA PHYSICAL MEDICINE

NYA CHAMBLESS

Defendant

ALLSTATE

P.O. Box 650271

Dallas, TX 75265

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH PARRINO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/28/2021 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

09/28/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/29/2021 AS TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

09/28/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/29/2021 AS TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

11/03/2021 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/03/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

11/08/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

11/10/2021 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 11/8/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 11/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT: NOT PRESENT APPEARANCE WAIVED-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 959943; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 959943

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/29/2021 AS TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT-ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/29/2021 - id number 2286221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00 AssessmentID 11768344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC007144SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY