This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 13:33:23 (UTC).

NORTHLAND ECHO LAKE LLC VS VIVIAN JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 NORTHLAND ECHO LAKE LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VIVIAN JAMES. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHLAND ECHO LAKE LLC

Defendants

WILL JAMES

VIVIAN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

03/06/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/26/2020

02/25/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/26/2020

DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 2/20/2020

02/21/2020 - DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 2/20/2020

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/21/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS POSTED WILL JAMES ON 02/06/2020

02/14/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED WILL JAMES ON 02/06/2020

SUMMONS POSTED VIVIAN JAMES ON 02/06/2020

02/14/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED VIVIAN JAMES ON 02/06/2020

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO: WILL JAMES AND VIVIAN JAMES

02/14/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO: WILL JAMES AND VIVIAN JAMES

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/14/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/12/2020 - ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/05/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO VIVIAN JAMES/ WILL JAMES 2/4/2020

02/04/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO VIVIAN JAMES/ WILL JAMES 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

02/04/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL RETURNED FROM JUDGE- COURT REVIEWED NO RESPONSE/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED WILL JAMES ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED VIVIAN JAMES ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO: WILL JAMES AND VIVIAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$205.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801369; Tender Amount: $205.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAPARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT/ THREE DAY NOTICE ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO VIVIAN JAMES/ WILL JAMES 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS