This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 14:00:25 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS CHAD M OYLER Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHAD M OYLER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********90AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

CHAD M OYLER

EVELEYN C OYLER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF

WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA BETH COLLINS

Defendant Attorney

KARI LYNNE MARTIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. AND DESIGNATION OF E-SERVICE ADDRESSES

03/15/2023 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. AND DESIGNATION OF E-SERVICE ADDRESSES

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

03/10/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS RETURNED NON- SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

03/10/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON- SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS SERVED CHAD M OYLER 3/6/2023

03/10/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED CHAD M OYLER 3/6/2023

DISCLAIMERCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

03/09/2023 - DISCLAIMERCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FORM II

02/23/2023 - FORM II

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/23/2023 - NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

02/23/2023 - CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/23/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. AND DESIGNATION OF E-SERVICE ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND TO BE SERVED URBAN DEVELOPMENT 3/8/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED EVELYN C OYLER 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON- SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED CHAD M OYLER 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMERCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $973.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1118855; Tender Amount: $973.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT CHAD M OYLER/ EVELYN C OYLER/ UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT/ WATERFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 -- ISSUED 2/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - TRUE AND CORRECT COPIES OF THE NOTE AND MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C - LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1118855

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/24/2023 - id number 2490355

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 12045039

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA000790CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less