This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/24/2023 at 10:48:05 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2 VS KAREY M LARAMIE

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2 filed an Other lawsuit against KAREY M LARAMIE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2

Defendant

KAREY M LARAMIE

Bradenton, FL 34212-7001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANA MICHELLE STERN

Defendant Attorney

SHERRI LYNN JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/05/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

07/05/2022 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 7/6/2022 AS TO KAREY M LARAMIE

07/05/2022 - SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 7/6/2022 AS TO KAREY M LARAMIE

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT

07/05/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT

SUMMONS SERVED KAREY M LARAMIE 7/13/2022

07/14/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED KAREY M LARAMIE 7/13/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHERRI L. JOHNSON OBO KAREY PAPIN F/K/A KAREY LARAMIE.

07/21/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHERRI L. JOHNSON OBO KAREY PAPIN F/K/A KAREY LARAMIE.

MOTION TO DISMISS - KAREY PAPIN FKA KAREY M LARAMIE

08/01/2022 - MOTION TO DISMISS - KAREY PAPIN FKA KAREY M LARAMIE

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MEETING 09/16/2022 AT 2:00PM

08/16/2022 - NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MEETING 09/16/2022 AT 2:00PM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/07/2022 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

07/05/2022 - COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 02:00PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MEETING 09/16/2022 AT 2:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS - KAREY PAPIN FKA KAREY M LARAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHERRI L. JOHNSON OBO KAREY PAPIN F/K/A KAREY LARAMIE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KAREY M LARAMIE 7/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1049246; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1049246

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 7/6/2022 AS TO KAREY M LARAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/6/2022 - id number 2402051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11924636

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CC003950CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less