This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 18:02:14 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-3 VS KAREY M LARAMIE

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-3 filed an Other lawsuit against KAREY M LARAMIE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-3

Defendant

KAREY M LARAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANA MICHELLE STERN

Defendant Attorney

SHERRI LYNN JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED 4/10/2023

05/16/2023 - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED 4/10/2023

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

05/10/2023 - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / FEDERAL AND CALIFORNIA COSIGNER NOTICES

07/05/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / FEDERAL AND CALIFORNIA COSIGNER NOTICES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/17/2023 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING- VIA ZOOM ON MAY 12, 2023 AT 10:10AM

04/12/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING- VIA ZOOM ON MAY 12, 2023 AT 10:10AM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/17/2023 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- DEFENDANT, KAREY M. LARAMIE,

04/10/2023 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- DEFENDANT, KAREY M. LARAMIE,

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

04/10/2023 - MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION- COPY OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

04/10/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION- COPY OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED 4/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING JULY 14, 2023 AT 09:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 10:10AM - JACS-DEFAULT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 10:10AM - JACS-DEFAULT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 10:20AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1049282

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED ON 7/7/2022 AS TO KAREY M LARAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - COSIGNED LOAN REQUEST/CREDIT AGREEMENT / NOTE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / FEDERAL AND CALIFORNIA COSIGNER NOTICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/6/2022 - id number 2402259

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11924858

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CC003953CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less