Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 13:05:56 (UTC).

NANCY SUE TAYLOR VS SELWYN JAMES SWE

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 NANCY SUE TAYLOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SELWYN JAMES SWE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NANCY SUE TAYLOR

Respondent

SELWYN JAMES SWE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAIME LYNN WALLACE

Respondent Attorney

EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S ANSWER TO HUSBAND'S COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$702.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 906158; Tender Amount: $295.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE EDWARD B. SOBEL, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR THE HUSBAND, SELWYN JAMES SWE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$702.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 904617; Tender Amount: $407.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NANCY SUE TAYLOR, WIFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER NANCY SUE TAYLOR, WIFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER NANCY SUE TAYLOR, WIFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: SELWYN JAMES SWE, HUSBAND 3/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, JAIME LYNN