This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 13:39:21 (UTC).

MORTON BUILDING 9 LLC VS CESAR RIVERA JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MORTON BUILDING 9 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CESAR RIVERA JR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTON BUILDING 9 LLC

Defendants

DIANNA MORALES

CESAR RIVERA JR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

02/24/2020 - REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER ON 02/06/2020

02/12/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER ON 02/06/2020

ORDER DISBURSING REMAINING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY

02/12/2020 - ORDER DISBURSING REMAINING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY

REQUEST TO RELEASE FUNDS FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/07/2020 - REQUEST TO RELEASE FUNDS FORWARDED TO JUDGE

STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

01/31/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUMMONS SERVED IRMA MORALES 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED IRMA MORALES 1-23-2020

SUMMONS SERVED CESAR RIVERA JR 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED CESAR RIVERA JR 1-23-2020

RESPONSE TO SUMMONS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

01/23/2020 - RESPONSE TO SUMMONS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT PAYABLE TO MORTON BUILDING 9 DBA BAYSHORE APARTMENTS $985.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING REMAINING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER ATTACHED TO REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO RELEASE FUNDS FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO SUMMONS RETURNED FROM JUDGE- COURT REVIEWED NOTED NO RESPONSE/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED IRMA MORALES 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED CESAR RIVERA JR 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO SUMMONS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,215.78; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797040; Tender Amount: $208.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE/ APARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DIANNA MORALES/CESAR RIVERA JR 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EACH DEFENDANT- HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less