This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/01/2020 at 08:55:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ROBERT MUNDY JR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERT MUNDY JR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROBERT MUNDY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALERIA I OBI

Defendant Attorney

JAIME EDWARD RICHARDS

 

Court Documents

JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

02/26/2020 - JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

02/26/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY J. EDWARD RICHARDS ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, ROBERT MUNDY JR

02/14/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY J. EDWARD RICHARDS ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, ROBERT MUNDY JR

LOWE'S CREDIT CARD ACCOUNT/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY/ BILL OF SALE-ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - LOWE'S CREDIT CARD ACCOUNT/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY/ BILL OF SALE-ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED ROBERT MUNDY JR ON 01/28/2020

01/28/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ROBERT MUNDY JR ON 01/28/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT MUNDY JR 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT MUNDY JR 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY J. EDWARD RICHARDS ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, ROBERT MUNDY JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ROBERT MUNDY JR ON 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797172; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLOWE'S CREDIT CARD ACCOUNT/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY/ BILL OF SALE-ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROBERT MUNDY JR 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less