This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:46:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS BRET GARDNER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRET GARDNER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********37AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

8875 Aero Drive Ste 200 San

Diego, CA 92123

Defendant

BRET GARDNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLEEN E LEHMANN

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/09/2020 - DEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

SUMMONS SERVED BRET GARDNER ON 01/27/2020

01/27/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED BRET GARDNER ON 01/27/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BRET GARDNER 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BRET GARDNER 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT SERVED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED BRET GARDNER ON 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797117; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketACCOUNT SUMMARY/ AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY / BILL OF SALE-ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO BRET GARDNER 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less