This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 18:18:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS SARAH BRADFORD

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SARAH BRADFORD. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

610 Broadway Longboat

Key, FL 34228

Defendant

SARAH BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLEEN E LEHMANN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

05/20/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

03/24/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 3/6/2020

03/05/2020 - ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 3/6/2020

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

02/06/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • Hearing06/04/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PAYAL CHATANI, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT NON SERVED CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Hearing04/20/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTIC ETO CONTINUE RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER FOR 6/4/2020 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT REPRESENTEDROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT NON SERVED CONTINUE FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$195.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 812688; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 3/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED SARAH BRADFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$195.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797126; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketACCOUNT STATEMENT- AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT/ CERTIFICATE OF CONFOIMITY/ BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT-ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SARAH BRADFORD 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less