Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/16/2021 at 03:15:21 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS KIM BLOOMQUIST

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIM BLOOMQUIST. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

KIM BLOOMQUIST

Palmetto, FL 34221-5719

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHAN ALEXI GREEN

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT

04/12/2021 - DEFAULT

SUMMONS SERVED KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/15/2021

03/15/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/15/2021

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/8/2021

03/01/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/8/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/01/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 10:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DEFAULTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY DEREK DIPASQUALE, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT SERVED DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 898193; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCAPITAL ONE STATEMENT AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO KIM BLOOMQUIST 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFORWARD FLOW RECEIVABLE SALE AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2018 CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFORWARD FLOW RECEIVABLE SALE AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2018 AFFIDAVIT OF SALE OF ACCOUNT BY CREDITOR AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFORWARD FLOW RECEIVABLE SALE AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2018 BILL OF SALE AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI